51 |
Shri Rakesh Kumar |
NSSO, DPC, Ahmedabad |
01-07-2013 to 01-09-2013( 34.00 KB ), 20-12-2012 to 01-03-2013( 71.38 KB ) |
52 |
Shri RAM KRIPAL |
DDG (FOD),Ajmer |
01-04-2012 to 31-10-2012( 285.75 KB ) |
53 |
Shri Ram Krishna |
DDG NSSO (FOD), Shimla |
01-04-2013 to 30-06-2013( 161.08 KB ), 01-01-2013 to 30-09-2013( 31.00 KB ), 01-01-2013 to 01-12-2013( 31.50 KB ), 01-01-2012 to 31-12-2012( 405.54 KB ), 01-04-2013 to 30-06-2013( 161.08 KB ) |
54 |
shri S Chakrabarti |
DDG (SSD) |
01-01-2012 to 01-12-2012( 109.01 KB ) |
55 |
Shri S.K. Das |
DDG |
01-01-2012 to 31-03-2012( 100.17 KB ), 01-01-2012 to 01-12-2012( 65.44 KB ) |
56 |
Shri S.K.Das |
DDG, DPD, NSSO Kolkata |
01-01-2012 to 01-03-2013( 48.00 KB ) |
57 |
Shri S.L Menaria |
DDG, NSSO (FOD), NZ, Jaipur |
01-04-2015 to 01-06-2016( 14.50 KB ) |
58 |
Shri S.L Menaria |
DG |
17-04-2022 to 19-07-2022( 94.91 KB ) |
59 |
Shri S.V.Ramana Murthy |
DDG (NAD),CSO |
01-01-2012 to 01-12-2012( 22.41 KB ) |
60 |
Shri Satya Narain Singh |
DDG (CPD) |
01-10-2012 to 01-12-2012( 10.93 KB ) |